11: MULTIPLY BY 25

SUTRA (Algorithm):

Divide Number by 4;
Put 00, 25, 50 or 75 on right;
for remainder 0, 1, 2 or 3.

00, if remainder is 0;
25, if remainder is 1;
50, if remainder is 2;
75, if remainder is 3

Demonstrations:

(1) 13 x 25 = ?
Dividing 13 by 4; get 3 and R 1
So 13 x 25 = 325

(2) 214 x 25 = ?

214 x 25 = 53 and R 2
214 x 25 = 5350

(3) 863 x 25 = ?

863 x 25 = 215 and R 3
863 x 25 = 21575

(4) 2148 x 25 = ?

2148 x 25 = 537 and R 0
2148 x 25 = 53700

(5) 30598 x 25 = ?

30598 x 25 = 7649 50

(6) 50237 x 25 = ?

50237 x 25 = 12559 25

Verify The following Examples:

  1. 528 x 25 >> 132 00 >> 13200
  2. 203 x 25 >> 50, 75 >> 5075
  3. 7654 x 25 >> 1913, 50 >> 191350
  4. 6003 x 25 >> 1500, 75 >> 150075
  5. 12345 x 25 >> 3086, 25 >> 308625
  6. 54 x 25 >> 13, 50 >> 1350