09: RAINBOW METHOD (PART II)

SUTRA (Algorithm):

Same as Method 08; Just EXTENTION

DEMONSTRATION

01) Consider: 3584 x 47 = ?

4x3|7x3 + 4x5|7x5 + 4x8|7x8 + 4x4|7x4
12|41|67|72|28
16|48|74|74|28
3584 x 47 = 168448

02) Consider: 738 x 264 = ?

2x7|6x7 + 2x3|4x7 + 6x3 + 2x8|4x3 + 6x8|4x8
14|48|62|60|32
19|54|68|63|32
738 x 264 = 194832

WORKED EXAMPLES:
Practice and improve your fluency

1) 5278 x 32 = 1618283916  2) 8969 x 74 = 66103879036
3) 527 x 832 = 4338742614  4) 896 x 974 = 871521578024