07: MULTIPLY 2 DIGITS BY 2 DIGITS

__ SUTRA (Algorithm):__

Read & Work from Right

(Left Left) | (Outer + Inner) | (Right Right)
Take 23 x 41

In 23:

**Left** is 2,

**Right** is 3.

In 41:

**Left** is 4,

**Right** is 1.

RightRight is 1x3, 3

Outer is 1x2, 2

Inner is 4x3, 12

LeftLeft is 4x2, 8

### Demonstration (1): 23 x 41 = ?

Read & Work from RIGHT
Left x Left | | | Outer + Inner | | | Right x Right |

4 x 2 | | | 1x2 + 4x3 | | | 3 x 1 |

4 x 2 | | | 2 + 12 | | | 3 x 1 |

8 | | | 14 | | | 3 |

23 x 41 = 8 | 14 | 3

23 x 41 = 9

_{1}43

So, in one line,

**23 x 41 = 9**_{1}43.

### Demonstration (2): 52 x 34 = ?

Read & Work from RIGHT
Left x Left | | | Outer + Inner | | | Right x Right |

15 | | | 26 | | | 8 |

52 x 34 = 17

_{2}68

So, in one line,

**52 x 34 = 17**_{2}68.

### Demonstration (3): 69 x 48 = ?

Read & Work from RIGHT
So, in one line, **69 x 48 = 3312**.
#### Verify The following Examples:

1) 53 x 26 | >> | 10 | 36 | 18 | = | 13 78 |

2) 29 x 63 | >> | 12 | 60 | 27 | = | 18 27 |

3) 46 x 59 | >> | 20 | 66 | 54 | = | 27 14 |

4) 87 x 26 | >> | 16 | 56 | 42 | = | 22 62 |

5) 38 x 57 | >> | 15 | 61 | 56 | = | 21 66 |

6) 79 x 64 | >> | 42 | 82 | 36 | = | 50 56 |