05: MULTIPLY ANY NUMBER BY 11

SUTRA (Algorithm):

Same As Method 04
Take care of CARRY-OVERS!

Demonstration (1): 79 x 11 = ?

Write from RIGHT
79 'Right digit' 9 9
79 7+9 = 16 169
79 'Last digit' 7 869

So, in one line, 79 x 11 = 8169.

Demonstration (2): 869 x 11 = ?

Write from RIGHT
869 'Right digit' 9 9
869 6+9 = 15 159
869 8+6 = 14 1559
869 'Last digit' 8 9559

So, in one line, 869 x 11 = 915159.

Demonstration (3): 7295 x 11 = ?


x11_general_300x110
Write from RIGHT
7295 'Right digit' 5 5
7295 9+5 = 14 145
7295 2+9 = 11 1245
7295 7+2 = 9 10245
7295 'Last digit' 7 80245

In one line, 7295 x 11 = 81012145.

Verify The following Examples:

  1. 862 x 11 = 91482
  2. 257 x 11 = 28127
  3. 7523 x 11 = 812753
  4. 689 x 11 = 715179
  5. 794 x 11 = 817134
  6. 3576 x 11 = 3913136
  7. 8709 x 11 = 915799
  8. 8274 x 11 = 91110114
  9. 84595 x 11 = 9131015145