04: MULTIPLY 'MORE' DIGITS BY 11

SUTRA (Algorithm):

Work and Write from Right to Left

Right Digit;
Add Two, Two Digits;
Left Digit

Demonstration (1): 2435 x 11 = ?


x11_arrowS_300x110

Write from RIGHT

2435 'Right digit' 5 5
2435 3+5 = 8 85
2435 4+3 = 7 785
2435 2+4 = 6 6785
2435 'Last digit' 2 26785
So, in one line, 2435 x 11 = 26785.

Demonstration (2): 8563 x 11 = ?

Write from RIGHT

8563 'Right digit' 3 3
8563 6+3 = 9 93
8563 5+6 = 11 1193
8563 8+5 = 13 (+1)=14 14193
8563 'Last digit' 8 + (1)=9 94193
So, in one line, 8563 x 11 = 94193.

Verify The following Examples:

  1. 532 x 11 = 5852
  2. 317 x 11 = 3487
  3. 2543 x 11 = 27973
  4. 6306 x 11 = 69366
  5. 427 x 11 = 4697
  6. 305 x 11 = 3355
  7. 709 x 11 = 7799
  8. 804 x 11 = 8844
  9. 4536 x 11 = 49896