03: MULTIPLY 2-DIGIT NUMBER BY 11

SUTRA (Algorithm):

Push the SUM of Digits
in between the Digits
(Only if SUM of digits is 9 or less)

Demonstration (1): 32 x 11 = ?

3 + 2 is 5;
Push this between 3 & 2; get 352.


So, in one line, 32 x 11 = 352.

Demonstration (2): 43 x 11 = ?

4 + 3 is 7;
Push this between 4 & 3; get 473.
So, in one line, 43 x 11 = 473.

Verify The following Examples:

  1. 52 x 11 = 572
  2. 37 x 11 = 3 + 7 = 10,
    so NOT this method!
  3. 24 x 11 = 264
  4. 63 x 11 = 693
  5. 42 x 11 = 462
  6. 35 x 11 = 385
  7. 75 x 11 = 7 + 5 = 12,
    so NOT this method!
  8. 81 x 11 = 891
  9. 45 x 11 = 495